Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules Lecouvet

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Titular Bishop of Scyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1880Born
3 Jan 190423.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 194969.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
9 Jul 194969.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Scyrus
8 Sep 194969.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scyrus
31 May 195979.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Jules Lecouvet
Bishop Jules Lecouvet (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHollain

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast