Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Désinord Jean

Bishop of Hinche, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1967 Born
13 Nov 199427.1Ordained PriestPriest of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
4 Apr 201648.5AppointedBishop of Hinche, Haïti
2 Jul 201648.7Ordained BishopBishop of Hinche, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Désinord Jean
Bishop Désinord Jean (born ) Bishop of Hinche

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFurcy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hinche.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 7 Apr 2016
  • name: CB, 1 Jul 2016
  • c2: CB, 2 Jul 2016
  • c34: CB, 4 Jul 2016
  • c134: CB, 6 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,951
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017