Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Lafontant

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince

Titular Bishop of Gilba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1937 BornJacmel
29 Jun 196325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
25 Nov 198648.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
25 Nov 198648.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gilba
25 Jan 198749.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gilba
27 Jul 201375.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Joseph Lafontant:
Bishop Joseph Lafontant (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Port-au-Prince

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013