Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József-Csaba Pál

Bishop of Timişoara, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1955 Born
21 Jun 198125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Alba Iulia, Romania
2000²44.0IncardinatedPriest of Timişoara, Romania
16 May 201862.4AppointedBishop of Timişoara, Romania
6 Aug 201862.6Ordained BishopBishop of Timişoara, Romania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József-Csaba Pál
Bishop József-Csaba Pál (born ) Bishop of Timişoara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrumoasa/Csíkszépvíz, Diocese of Alba Iulia
Ordained BishopSaint György, Cathedral, Timişoara, Diocese of Timişoara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Timişoara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 May 2018
  • bd/ob: CB, 16 May 2018
  • inca/c1: CB, 16 May 2018
  • c2+: CB, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast