Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomislav Rogić

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1963 Born
22 Jun 199127.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rijeka-Senj, Croatia
25 May 200036.5IncardinatedPriest of Gospić-Senj, Croatia
3 Jun 201652.5AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
25 Jul 201652.7Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Tomislav Rogić (VIAF: 305600721)
Bishop Tomislav Rogić (born ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSenj
Ordained BishopSaint Jacques, Cathedral, Šibenik, Diocese of Šibenik (Knin)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Šibenik (Knin).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,067

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast