Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ivan Prendja

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1939Born
29 Jun 196424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
29 Mar 199050.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
9 Jun 199050.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
2 Feb 199656.0SucceededArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
25 Jan 201070.0DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Prendja
Archbishop Ivan Prendja (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZemunik

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,592
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast