Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Ekezia Ilonu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Okigwe, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1937Born
19 Dec 196427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Umuahia, Nigeria
24 Jan 198143.1AppointedBishop of Okigwe, Nigeria
29 Mar 198143.3Ordained BishopBishop of Okigwe, Nigeria
22 Apr 200668.4ResignedBishop of Okigwe, Nigeria
17 Jun 201274.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Okigwe, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Anthony Ekezia Ilonu
Bishop Anthony Ekezia Ilonu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Okigwe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNdiogbuonyeome

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006
  • d: CB, 18 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018