Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amand Louis Marie Antoine Hubert, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eliopoli di Egitto

Titular Bishop of Sais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1900BornSaint-Sulpice-des-Landes, France
28 Jun 192423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
7 Apr 195958.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eliopoli di Egitto, Egypt
7 Apr 195958.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sais
24 May 195958.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sais
29 Apr 197877.8RetiredVicar Apostolic of Eliopoli di Egitto, Egypt
21 Jul 198080.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eliopoli di Egitto, Egypt

MicroData Summary for Amand Louis Marie Antoine Hubert:
Bishop Amand Louis Marie Antoine Hubert S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Eliopoli di Egitto

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 47
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013