Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Eliopoli di Egitto

Apostolicus Vicariatus Heliopolis in Aegypto

United

To: Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Delta del Nilo
25 January 1886ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Delta del Nilo (erected)
15 May 1891ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Delta del Nilo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Delta del Nilo
17 September 1909ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Delta del Nilo Vicariate Apostolic of Delta del Nilo
Vicariate Apostolic of Eliopoli di Egitto
27 January 1951Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Delta del Nilo Vicariate Apostolic of Eliopoli di Egitto
30 November 1987UnitedVicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto}
Vicariate Apostolic of Eliopoli di Egitto
Vicariate Apostolic of Port-Said
Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Delta del Nilo
195010,7585,000,000.2%485891208448615ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Eliopoli di Egitto
19702,14011,000,000.0%270722992360ap1971
19801,6004667022833505ap1981

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 30 Jun 2013