Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pankratius von Dinkel

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1811BornStaffelstein
17 Aug 183423.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bamberg, Germany
31 Aug 183423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bamberg, Germany
16 Jul 185847.4SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
27 Sep 185847.6ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
21 Nov 185847.8Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
8 Oct 189483.7DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Pankratius von Dinkel:
Bishop Pankratius von Dinkel (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013