Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Cano Almirante, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1761Born
11 Nov 181856.9SelectedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
21 Dec 181857.0ConfirmedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
1 Oct 182058.8Ordained BishopBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
17 Jun 182563.5SelectedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
19 Dec 182564.0ConfirmedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
22 Sep 182664.7DiedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Cano Almirante
Bishop Fernando Cano Almirante O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillaverde de Frades, Diocese of Zamora
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 80, and Page 130
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 139, Number 754
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 48
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,735

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 20 Dec 2020

Quantcast