Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anastasio Granados García

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1909BornEspinoso del Rey
24 Feb 193424.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 196050.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
30 Apr 196050.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cidramus
5 Jun 196050.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cidramus
31 Mar 197060.6AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
13 Feb 197868.4DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Anastasio Granados García:
Bishop Anastasio Granados García (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013