Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís Herbst, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1925Born
8 Dec 195126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
7 Aug 197953.7AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Juruá, Acre, Brazil
11 Nov 197953.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Juruá, Acre, Brazil
25 Jun 198761.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil
7 Dec 198863.0SucceededBishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil
3 Jan 200175.1RetiredBishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil
31 Dec 201792.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luís Herbst
Bishop Luís Herbst C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cruzeiro do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBardenberg
Ordained BishopN. D. de Gloire, Cathedral, Cruzeiro do Sul, Territorial Prelature of Juruá, Acre
Death PlaceCruzeiro do Sul, Diocese of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Jan 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Mar 2021

Quantcast