Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Cruzeiro do Sul

Dioecesis Crucis Australis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mosé João Pontelo, C.S.Sp., Bishop
  • Luís Herbst, C.S.Sp., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 June 1987
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Porto Velho
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Acre
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 126,633 (48,911 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte I
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesecruzeirodosul.org/
  • Mailing Address: Residencia Episcopal, Praca da Gloria 185, 69980-000 Cruzeiro do Sul, AC, Brazil
  • Telephone: (068)3322-8931
  • Fax: 3322-2480

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Juruá
22 May 1931ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Tefé Territorial Prelature of Juruá (erected)
Diocese of Cruzeiro do Sul
25 June 1987ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Juruá Diocese of Cruzeiro do Sul
31 August 2001Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Cruzeiro do Sul (from Manaus)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Juruá
195075,00078,00096.2%11116,8181426ap1951
196499,370316195,23016206ap1967
1970113,000115,00098.3%217195,947212110ap1971
1976118,250120,00098.5%319225,375264111ap1977
1980137,000140,00097.9%219216,523276212ap1981
Diocese of Cruzeiro do Sul
1990135,000146,00092.5%716235,869269512ap1991
1999155,000169,00091.7%1015256,200358512ap2000
2000160,000180,00088.9%1015256,400358512ap2001
2001161,600182,00088.8%1012227,345188512ap2003
2003170,060226,74875.0%1012227,730237412ap2004
2004170,625227,50075.0%1013237,418286712ap2005
2006180,959241,27975.0%1112237,867239112ap2007
2011201,000261,00077.0%1711287,178168712ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 13 Nov 2012