Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Rüth, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1913BornEssen-Steele, Germany
4 Nov 193926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Jun 196653.4AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Juruá, Acre, Brazil
21 Jun 196653.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptiminus
2 Oct 196653.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptiminus
7 Feb 196754.0SucceededPrelate of Juruá, Acre, Brazil
26 May 197865.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Leptiminus
25 Jun 198774.4AppointedBishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil
7 Dec 198875.9RetiredBishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil
23 Oct 200693.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Rüth:
Bishop Heinrich Rüth C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cruzeiro do Sul

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015