Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Haas, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1877BornEersel, Netherlands
9 Mar 190225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Mar 193760.2AppointedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Jul 193760.6Ordained BishopBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
1 Aug 195679.6DiedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José de Haas:
Bishop José de Haas O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí)

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013