Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrose James Moriarty

Deceased

Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1870Born
10 Mar 189423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 193161.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 193161.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
28 Jan 193261.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
17 Dec 193464.3SucceededBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
3 Jun 194978.8DiedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ambrose James Moriarty (VIAF: 89251791)
Bishop Ambrose James Moriarty (born , died ) Bishop of Shrewsbury

EventPlace
Birth Place38 Mottram Street, Stockport, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Ordained PriestOur Lady and St. Peter of Alcantara, Cathedral, Shrewsbury, Shropshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady and St. Peter of Alcantara, Cathedral, Shrewsbury, Shropshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Death PlaceCouncil House, Shrewsbury, Shropshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Shrewsbury, Shropshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 5
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 153
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,299
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018