Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Edward Rueger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Maronana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1929Born
6 Jan 195828.2Ordained PriestPriest of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
16 Jan 198757.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
16 Jan 198757.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronana
25 Feb 198757.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maronana
25 Jan 200575.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
6 Apr 201989.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for George Edward Rueger
Bishop George Edward Rueger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Worcester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFramingham, Diocese of Worcester, Massachusetts
Death PlaceWorcester, Diocese of Worcester, Massachusetts

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 8 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast