Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Francis Ryan

Deceased

Bishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1879Born
10 Aug 190526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
11 Nov 194465.6AppointedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
3 Jan 194565.8Ordained BishopBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
3 Nov 195677.6DiedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Francis Ryan
Bishop Edward Francis Ryan (born , died ) Bishop of Burlington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLynn

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast