Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Alphonsus Harrington

Deceased

Bishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1900Born
29 May 192625.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 195251.9AppointedBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
20 Nov 195252.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
1 Aug 197372.8DiedBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Alphonsus Harrington
Bishop Michael Alphonsus Harrington (born , died ) Bishop of Kamloops

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillaloe

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast