Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Smith

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pembroke, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1897BornGreenfield
16 Jun 192730.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 194548.4AppointedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
25 Jul 194548.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
8 Aug 194548.6InstalledBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
8 Feb 197174.1ResignedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
28 Oct 198689.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Smith:
Bishop William Joseph Smith (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pembroke

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014