Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maxmilián von Hamilton

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1714Born
10 Aug 173824.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
17 Aug 173824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
4 Mar 176146.9SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
17 Aug 176147.4ConfirmedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
27 Sep 176147.5Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
31 Oct 177662.6DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Maxmilián von Hamilton
Bishop Maxmilián von Hamilton (born , died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast