Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Hannibal von Blümegen

Deceased

Bishop of Hradec Králové


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1716³BornWien
21 Sep 174226.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
23 Sep 174226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
5 Nov 176347.4SelectedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
9 Apr 176447.8ConfirmedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
27 May 176447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic
17 Oct 177458.3DiedBishop of Hradec Králové, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hermann Hannibal von Blümegen:
Bishop Hermann Hannibal von Blümegen (born , died ) Bishop of Hradec Králové

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 18
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015