Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto Honorius von Egkh und Hungersbach

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1675³BornBratislava
169721.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
3 Aug 172954.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
3 Aug 172954.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
18 Sep 172954.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
21 Apr 174973.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Otto Honorius von Egkh und Hungersbach:
Bishop Otto Honorius von Egkh und Hungersbach (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 375
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015