Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Julian von Braida

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1654Born
168126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
4 Jun 170349.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
4 Jun 170349.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
25 Jul 170349.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
26 Jun 172975.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Franz Julian von Braida
Bishop Franz Julian von Braida (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZnaim

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 222
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast