Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Franz von Chorinsky

Deceased

Bishop of Brno, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1720Born
2 Apr 174322.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
5 Apr 174322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
11 Sep 176948.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
11 Sep 176948.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Samaria
16 Oct 176949.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samaria
9 Jun 177756.6SelectedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
15 Dec 177757.1ConfirmedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
30 Oct 178666.0DiedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Matthias Franz von Chorinsky
Bishop Matthias Franz von Chorinsky (born , died ) Bishop of Brno

EventPlace
Birth PlacePatschlawitz

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,927
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 133, and Page 365
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast