Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ferdinand Julius Cardinal von Troyer

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1698Born
24 Feb 172022.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
21 Dec 172022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
9 Dec 174547.8SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
28 Mar 174648.1ConfirmedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
22 May 174648.3Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
10 Apr 174749.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Feb 175860.0DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Julius von Troyer
Ferdinand Julius Cardinal von Troyer (born , died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInnsbruck, Italy

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Apr 1747
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast