Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Karl Leopold von Scharffenberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

Titular Bishop of Tanagra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1698³BornLangenwang
19 Sep 172224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
21 Apr 174950.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
21 Apr 174950.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanagra
18 May 174950.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanagra
17 Apr 177172.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Karl Leopold von Scharffenberg:
Bishop Johann Karl Leopold von Scharffenberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 391, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015