Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Michael Cyriakus von Hallweil

Deceased

Bishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

Bishop of Austria, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1706³Born
12 Mar 172922.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
11 Jun 172922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
4 Mar 174134.5SelectedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
29 May 174134.8ConfirmedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
18 Jun 174134.8Ordained BishopBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria
177366.3AppointedBishop of Austria, Military
2 Jun 177366.8DiedBishop of Wiener Neustadt, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Michael Cyriakus von Hallweil
Bishop Ferdinand Michael Cyriakus von Hallweil (born , died ) Bishop of Wiener Neustadt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Ordained BishopWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 306
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast