Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Xaver Anton Marxer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1704³BornHeiligenkreuz
13 Mar 172823.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
22 May 172824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
6 May 174843.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
6 May 174843.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
26 May 174844.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
26 May 177571.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver Anton Marxer:
Bishop Franz Xaver Anton Marxer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 164, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015