Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold Friedrich von Egkh und Hungersbach

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1696BornHamburg
15 Nov 172125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
27 Apr 175861.9SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
2 Oct 175862.3ConfirmedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
19 Nov 175862.5Ordained BishopBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
15 Dec 176064.5DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Leopold Friedrich von Egkh und Hungersbach:
Bishop Leopold Friedrich von Egkh und Hungersbach (born , died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015