Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Billington, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kampala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1904BornBlackburn, Great Britain
20 Jul 193026.1Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
13 May 194843.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kampala, Uganda
13 May 194843.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Avissa
26 Jul 194844.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avissa
25 Mar 195348.8AppointedBishop of Kampala, Uganda
3 May 196560.9ResignedBishop of Kampala, Uganda
3 May 196560.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Fallaba
7 Dec 197066.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Fallaba
6 Oct 197672.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Kampala, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Vincent Billington:
Bishop Vincent Billington M.H.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kampala

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015