Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Francis Regis Canevin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania

Titular Archbishop of Pelusium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1853BornBeatty, PA
4 Jun 187926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
16 Jan 190349.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
16 Jan 190349.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sabrata
24 Feb 190349.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sabrata
20 Dec 190451.5SucceededBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Jan 192167.6ResignedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Jan 192167.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pelusium
22 Mar 192773.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Francis Regis Canevin:
Archbishop John Francis Regis Canevin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 457, and Page 490
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013