Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred-Jean Guyomard, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

Titular Bishop of Assava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1884Born
11 Jul 190924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 Jan 192439.2AppointedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
9 Mar 192439.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
18 Jul 195065.7ResignedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
18 Jul 195065.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Assava
27 Feb 195671.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Alfred-Jean Guyomard
Bishop Alfred-Jean Guyomard O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jaffna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErquy, France

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1924, Number 11
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 300, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast