Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerome Emilianus Pillai, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1901Born
7 Jul 192927.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
10 Mar 194947.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
10 Mar 194947.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bladia
22 May 194947.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bladia
18 Jul 195048.9SucceededBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
17 Jul 197270.9DiedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Jerome Emilianus Pillai
Bishop Jerome Emilianus Pillai O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Jaffna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWennappuwa

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,949, Number 35
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 300, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast