Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaston Robichez, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1866Born
30 Jan 189629.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Mar 191750.3AppointedBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka
8 Jul 191750.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka
12 Feb 194679.2DiedBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Gaston Robichez
Bishop Gaston Robichez S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Trincomalee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAire-sur-la-Lys, France

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast