Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel Regueras y López

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1870Born
25 Jul 189524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oviedo, Spain
26 May 191544.8AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
12 Sep 191545.1Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
26 Oct 192353.2AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
28 Dec 192454.3DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ángel Regueras y López
Bishop Ángel Regueras y López (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenavente

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast