Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rigoberto Domenech y Valls

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1870BornAlcoy
19 May 189423.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 191645.4AppointedBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
1 Oct 191645.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
16 Dec 192454.0AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
30 May 195584.5DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rigoberto Domenech y Valls:
Archbishop Rigoberto Domenech y Valls (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,139
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015