Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joaquín Cardinal Lluch y Garriga, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1816BornManresa
1838²21.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
27 Sep 185842.6AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
12 Dec 185842.8Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
3 Aug 185943.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
13 Mar 186852.1AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
16 Jan 187457.9AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
20 Mar 187761.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
7 May 187761.2SelectedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
22 Jun 187761.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
27 Mar 188266.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 188266.6DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Lluch y Garriga:
Cardinal Joaquín Lluch y Garriga O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
  • a cardinal for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 141, and Page 177
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 203, and Page 309
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 491
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Mar 1882
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 167, Number 917

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013