Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Moreira Bastos Neto

Deceased

Bishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1953Born
28 Oct 197926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
7 Jan 200955.9AppointedBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
19 Apr 200956.2Ordained BishopBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
3 May 200956.2InstalledBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
26 Apr 201461.2DiedBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Moreira Bastos Neto
Bishop José Moreira Bastos Neto (born , died ) Bishop of Três Lagoas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSimonésia

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,153
  • d: CB, 26 Apr 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast