Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geraldo Daniel Joseph Scarpone Caporale, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Comayagua, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1928Born
24 Jun 195627.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jan 197950.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras
21 Feb 197950.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras
30 May 197950.6SucceededBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
21 May 200475.6RetiredBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
29 Oct 201688.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Comayagua, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Daniel Joseph Scarpone Caporale
Bishop Geraldo Daniel Joseph Scarpone Caporale O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Comayagua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWatertown, MA, USA
Death PlaceManagua, Archdiocese of Managua, Nicaragua

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2016, Number 19
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • mn: CB, 19 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast