Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonardo Marsili

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1641³Born
17 May 166524.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 168240.6AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
8 Feb 1682³40.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siena, Italy
8 Apr 171371.8DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Marsili (VIAF: 89189680)
Archbishop Leonardo Marsili (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Siena, Archdiocese of Siena

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 353
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 29
  • ob/c2: AT, 26 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 May 2017