Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. Pier Marcellino Cardinal Corradini

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1658BornSezze, Italy
10 Jun 170244.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 170749.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
27 Nov 170749.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
18 May 171253.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
26 Sep 171254.3Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 171254.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
11 Sep 172668.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
10 Apr 173475.8ResignedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
15 Dec 173476.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
8 Feb 174384.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
19 May 1993Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Pier Marcellino Corradini:
Bl. Pier Marcellino Cardinal Corradini (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
  • a cardinal for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712
  • ob/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • ob/c2+: AT, 23 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015