Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Baistrocchi, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

Titular Bishop of Anastasiopolis

Titular See: Maurizio de Santa Teresa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1662BornParma
167815.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
12 May 170845.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India
12 May 170845.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
14 Apr 170946.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
15 May 172663.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Antonio Baistrocchi:
Bishop Antonio Baistrocchi O. Carm. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,641
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 25 Jun 2015