Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Giacinto Lascaris, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1653BornNice
19 Sep 167622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 May 171157.5AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
17 May 171157.5Ordained BishopBishop of Spoleto, Italy
17 Mar 172773.3DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giacinto Lascaris:
Bishop Carlo Giacinto Lascaris O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Spoleto

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 362
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015