Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Aldobrandini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1667BornFirenze, Italy
16 Oct 170740.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 170740.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
27 Nov 170740.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
7 Mar 170840.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Jun 1713³46.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
22 Sep 171346.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
1720²52.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
13 Dec 172053.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
2 Oct 173063.4Elevated to Cardinal
May 1731³64.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
3 Sep 173164.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
14 Aug 173467.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Aldobrandini (VIAF: 76105985)
Alessandro Cardinal Aldobrandini (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

  • a priest for 26.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
  • a cardinal for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1730
  • ob/c2+: AT, 23 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 29
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,434
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Oct 2016