Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lodovico Cardinal Pico Della Mirandola

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1668BornMirandola
25 Jun 170637.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
11 Jul 170637.5Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
18 May 171243.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
26 Sep 171243.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 171243.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
22 Nov 171748.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Senigallia, Italy
10 Sep 172455.7ResignedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
24 Apr 172859.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
Jul 1730³61.5AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
1731¹62.0ResignedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
9 Apr 173162.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
29 Aug 174071.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
10 Aug 174374.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lodovico Pico Della Mirandola:
Lodovico Cardinal Pico Della Mirandola (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a bishop for 37.0 years
  • a cardinal for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712
  • ob/c2+: AT, 23 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015