Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Capece

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1664³Born
23 Apr 170339.2AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
29 Apr 170339.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
Feb 1722³58.0DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Capece
Archbishop Vincenzo Capece (born , died Feb 1722) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceChieti, Archdiocese of Chieti
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Chieti, Archdiocese of Chieti

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 373
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 38
  • ob/c23/loc: AT, 13 Aug 2020
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast