Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maria Brancaccio, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1659¹BornNapoli
4 Jun 170344.4AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
17 Jun 170344.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
10 Dec 172263.9DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Brancaccio:
Archbishop Antonio Maria Brancaccio C.R. (born 1659, died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 67
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015