Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni de Lerma

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664¹BornAlbano
12 Mar 170844.1AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
14 Mar 172561.2ResignedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
20 Mar 172561.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
1 Nov 174076.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Lerma:
Archbishop Giovanni de Lerma (born 1664, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1724
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 358, and Page 397
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015